skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:36:24 AM

Horsham, Patricia Angela Mona

CPSO#: 30643

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Mile Walk In Medical Clinic
153-1880 Eglinton Ave
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Fax: (416) 285-7574 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1883 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z9
Canada
Phone: (613) 526-2850
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANGELA MONA HORSHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORSHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013