skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:57:42 PM

Ho, May Tze-May

CPSO#: 30554

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 1983