skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:01:57 AM

Elliott, James Arthur

CPSO#: 30472

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015