skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:32:28 AM

Vivian, Anthony Charles Harvey

CPSO#: 30426

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: www.medrecords.ca or 1-604-800-7079
Date Received: 13 May 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019