skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:53:43 AM

Perera, Clara Philomena

CPSO#: 30316

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 2006

Summary

Date of Death: 14-May-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ceylon, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2006