skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:33:50 AM

Wong, Frank Gee

CPSO#: 30309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C
309 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6J 1Y4
Phone: (519) 657-5434
Fax: (519) 641-7734 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Frank G. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Wong ( CPSO# 30309 )

Business Address:
Unit C
309 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6J 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 657-5434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRANK GEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1978