skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:35:22 PM

Leith, Eric Stephen

CPSO#: 30307

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 842-6555
Fax: (905) 842-4190 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cleveland Clinic Canada Downtown
181 Bay Street
suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6750
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MCI The Doctor's Office
200 Windflower Gate
unit 700
Woodbridge ON  L4L9L3
Canada
Phone: 905-856-2100
Fax: 905-856-2101
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Women's College Hospital
Allergy Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6137
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Diane Leith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leith ( CPSO# 30307 )
Dr. D. Leith ( CPSO# 32515 )

Business Address:
200 - 2920 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6B 3S8
Phone Number: (416) 782-2211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC STEPHEN LEITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1978