skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 6:43:08 PM

Munro, Susan Lorraine

CPSO#: 30294

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone: (519) 354-5540
Fax: (519) 354-6120 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham, ON N7L 1V8
Chatham ON  N7L 1V8
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Susan L. Munro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Munro ( CPSO# 30294 )

Business Address:
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 354-4893

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN LORRAINE MUNRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNRO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1978