skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:15:13 PM

Lowcock, Donald Gordon

CPSO#: 30284

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Mar 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.G. Lowcock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Avenue Medical Centre 221 Brant Ave Brantford ON N3T 3J2
Date Received: 28 Mar 2019


Address: Avenue Medical Centre 221 Brant Avenue Brantford ON N3T 3J2
Date Received: 27 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Mar 2019