skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 8:23:40 AM

Apostol, Athanassios Tony

CPSO#: 30131

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Apostolopoulos, Athanassios (used until: 17 Feb 1999 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.T. Apostol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017