skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:14:50 PM

Roach, Muriel Phyllis

CPSO#: 29903

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 May 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Muriel Roach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roach ( CPSO# 29903 )

Business Address:
Suite 900
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 671-9766

Business Address:
4763 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 224-8800

Business Address:
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (905) 278-7077

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 28 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 01 Jun 2019 Active
             As from June 1, 2019, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Muriel Phyllis Roach,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Roach to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. MURIEL PHYLLIS ROACH
                                             ("Dr. Roach")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public; 
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Roach, certificate of registration number 29903, am a member of
                  the College. I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment. I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Roach, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately (June 1, 2019).

            (4)   I, Dr. Roach, undertake that I will not practise medicine in any
                  jurisdiction until each and 
                  every one of the following conditions have been met:
                  
                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and 
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Roach, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of the OHIP that my billing
                  number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to
                  practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to
                  practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (6)   I, Dr. Roach, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (7)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practise, the College may, among other things: 

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, conditions or limitations
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Roach's
                        knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Roach has
                        voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and
                        therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or
                        services. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Roach, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 1, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Muriel Phyllis Roach to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective JUne 1, 2019:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Roach’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Roach has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.