skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 12:51:08 PM

Jain, Subhash Chandra

CPSO#: 29859

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Vikram University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Subhash Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 1-877-398-5932 www.rsrs.com
Instructions: From July 27, 2015, patients may contact the above for medical records.
Date Received: 17 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2015