skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 12:58:32 PM

Merchea, Man Mohan

CPSO#: 29616

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Sep 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Vikram University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health Centre
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6284
Fax: (519) 646-6150 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohan Merchea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Merchea ( CPSO# 29616 )

Business Address:
Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6284


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAN MOHAN MERCHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCHEA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1977