skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 11:46:09 PM

Pang, Patrick Ka-Kee

CPSO#: 29527

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1977
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3700 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 6A8
Phone: (905) 295-4323 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick Pang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Pang ( CPSO# 29527 )

Business Address:
3700 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 6A8
Phone Number: (905) 295-4323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICK KA-KEE PANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1977

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Oct 1988
Summary:

 In October 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Pang guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Pang be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence 
 to practice be suspended for a period of three months.  The Committee also ruled, however, that 
 this suspension would itself be suspended provided that the Doctor submitted to evaluation by the 
 McMaster Physician Review Program, and successfully completed any remedial program which might be 
 recommended as a result of that evaluation.  The Committee also recommended that the name of the 
 physician, along with the penalties, be published in the College bulletin.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 04 Apr 1989
Hearing Date(s): 18 Oct 1988