skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:37:22 PM

Cunningham, David George

CPSO#: 29403

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Nov 2007
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1600 Scot St
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 614-3600 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1976 to 14 Jun 1977
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011 Active
             1.    Dr. David George Cunningham may practice in administrative medicine.

            2.    Dr. Cunningham shall not treat patients.