skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:10:58 PM

Johnson, Wayne Douglas

CPSO#: 29174

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wayne D. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Arkona Medical Centre, 14 Ubion Street, Arkona, ON, N0M 1B0
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016