skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:15:51 AM

Dodgson, Bruce Gordon

CPSO#: 29172

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bruce G. Dodgson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital For Sick Children, 555 University Avenue, Toronto, ON, M5G 1X8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016