skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:11:01 PM

Cogan, Farrell Shelley

CPSO#: 29171

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan Health Management Inc.
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5927 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Farrell Cogan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Cogan ( CPSO# 29171 )

Business Address:
Medcan Health Management Inc.
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARRELL SHELLEY COGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977