skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:22:24 PM

Carruthers, Benjamin Carl

CPSO#: 29141

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carruthers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Cescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638 / 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 12 Jan 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018