skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 7:15:09 PM

Ford-Jones, Elizabeth Lee

CPSO#: 29111

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: Pearson, Elizabeth Lee (used until: 17 Feb 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 555 University Ave Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 29 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019