skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:48:25 PM

Telner, Adam Henry

CPSO#: 29077

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 May 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 May 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Telner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Telner ( CPSO# 29077 )

Business Address:
LMC Endocrinology Centres
107 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM HENRY TELNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1977