skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 5:17:09 PM

Keeton, Michael

CPSO#: 28988

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Keeton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 300 581 Argus Road Oakville ON L6J 3J3
Date Received: 30 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: May 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Keeton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective Mary 30, 2016:


Dr. Keeton was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Keeton resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)