skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:35:34 PM

Rusthoven, James Jacob

CPSO#: 28987

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Mar 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Illinois, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES JACOB RUSTHOVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSTHOVEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1977