skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:06:59 PM

Ibey, Margaret Mary

CPSO#: 28976

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Margaret Ibey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 101-60 Bowes St Parry Sound ON P2A 2L3
Date Received: 20 Nov 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 2018