skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:58:57 PM

Dubinsky, Leslie

CPSO#: 28822

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2018