skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 6:59:47 PM

Fox, Sherida Penelope

CPSO#: 28721

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992