skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:27:24 PM

McKibbin, Timothy Giles

CPSO#: 28658

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T. G. McKibbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 201-1370 Clyde Avenue, Ottawa, ON K2E 3H8
Date Received: 09 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jan 2017