skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:38:59 PM

Rogers, Anne Theresa

CPSO#: 28553

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 1984