skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 6:56:05 PM

Guertin, Lina Yvette

CPSO#: 28411

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1995