skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 5:16:55 PM

Golberg, John Wilbert

CPSO#: 28367

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1998