skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/05/2019 11:10:38 PM

Green, Michael

CPSO#: 28361

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905)372-6811 Ext. 0
Fax: (905) 373-6933 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Green Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Green ( CPSO# 28361 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976