skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:06:29 AM

Lewandowski, Bernard Joseph

CPSO#: 28230

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bernard Lewandowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2018