skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 12:10:05 AM

Hankey, Arthur Victor

CPSO#: 28228

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hankey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hankey ( CPSO# 28228 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Stroud Medical Centre 1-7869 Yonge St Innisfil ON L9S 1K8 Phone: 705-436-2251
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can send a written request to the address above or by the phone number above.
Date Received: 18 Dec 2018

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARTHUR VICTOR HANKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANKEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1976