skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:12:09 PM

Frank, John Williams

CPSO#: 28193

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rm 1-308
Teviot Hall
Teviot Pl
Edinburgh EH8 9AG
United Kingdom
Phone: +44 131 651159

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAMS FRANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1976