skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:12:55 PM

Griswold, William Arthur

CPSO#: 28123

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1983