skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 11:14:20 PM

Kanani, Subodh Dahyalal

CPSO#: 28060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Feb 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3170 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Suite 108
Toronto ON  M8V 3X8
Phone: (416) 259-3507
Fax: (416) 259-0233 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Subodh Kanani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kanani ( CPSO# 28060 )

Business Address:
108 - 3170 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 3X8
Phone Number: (416) 259-3507

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUBODH DAHYALAL KANANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1976