skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:37:18 AM

Thomas, Peter

CPSO#: 28025

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2130 Lawrence Ave. East
Scarborough
Toronto ON  M1R 3A6
Phone: 416 751 4356
Fax: 416 751 9104 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thomas ( CPSO# 28025 )

Business Address:
410 - 2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 751-4356

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1976