skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:39:24 PM

Joshi, Arvind Kumar

CPSO#: 27987

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 4605 Miller Avenue, Montreal, QC H3W 2E4
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015