skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:17:04 PM

Chui, Mario Chi-Cheung

CPSO#: 27965

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Nov 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL04
4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T7
Phone: (416) 293-5940
Fax: (416) 293-6036 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. C. Chui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chui ( CPSO# 27965 )

Business Address:
LL04 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P4
Phone Number: (416) 293-5940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIO CHI-CHEUNG CHUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1975