skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:24:00 AM

Offierski, Christopher Michael

CPSO#: 27847

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Sep 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104 Melrose Dr.,
RR#1
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0
Phone: (905) 371 6328 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Offierski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Offierski ( CPSO# 27847 )

Business Address:
300 - 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 357-2900

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents seeking access to a copy of their records may contact: Safe Store 2704 Hwy 20 Font Hill ON L0S 1E6 Tele: 905-892-0010 Fax: 905-892-9465
Date Received: 12 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL OFFIERSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OFFIERSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1975