skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:32:40 AM

Smiltnieks, Barbara Mary

CPSO#: 27749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 1975

Summary

Former Names: Dumanski, Barbara Mary (used until: 12 May 2002 )     Jaroszonek, Barbara Mary (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
722 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 743-6063
Fax: (416) 743-0101 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARBARA MARY SMILTNIEKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMILTNIEKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1975