skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:59:08 AM

Rajovic, Svetislav

CPSO#: 27609

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Mar 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Belgrade, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Mar 1984

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Jul 1982
Summary:

 In July 1982, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Rajovic guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found 
 guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Committee also found him 
 incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he 
 displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or 
 disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit 
 to continue in practice.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Rajovic(s licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 21 Jul 1983
Hearing Date(s): Jul 05, 1982

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 03 Oct 1988
Decision: Application Denied

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 28 Nov 1986
Decision: Application Denied

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 11 Jun 1986
Decision: Application Denied

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 24 Oct 1985
Decision: Application Denied


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jan 1980
Summary:

 In January 1980, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Rajovic guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he contravened a provision of Part III 
 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, the Health Insurance Act, 1972, or the 
 regulations, contrary to s. 26(2); in that he charged a fee for services not performed, contrary 
 to s. 26(14); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine 
 that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31).  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Rajovic be reprimanded; that he be fined the sum of $250.00, and that his licence 
 to practice be suspended for a period of thirty days.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 22 Jan 1981
Hearing Date(s): 28 Jan 1980