skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 5:11:03 AM

Puodziukas, Julius George

CPSO#: 27497

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Oct 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Oct 1991

Summary

Date of Death: 2-Oct-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1991