skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 11:47:40 AM

Drury, Robert Donald

CPSO#: 27470

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert D. Drury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Drury ( CPSO# 27470 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
301 - 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4L8
Phone Number: (705) 324-2581

Business Address:
Weeneebayko Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
1515 Blanshard Street
Victoria BC  V8W 3C8
Phone Number: (877) 357-4757

Business Address:
105 - 199 Grafton Street
Charlottetown PE  C1A 1L2
Phone Number: (902) 566-5212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT DONALD DRURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRURY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2019