skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 2:04:09 PM

Doumani-Semino, Shelley Jacquelyn Margaret

CPSO#: 27457

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Doumani, Shelley Jacquelyn Margaret (used until: 22 May 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014