skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:48:18 PM

Porter, Robert Charles

CPSO#: 27388

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 1976 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1974 to 14 Jun 1975
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1975 to 14 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013