skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:18:42 PM

Devlin, Samuel Rueben

CPSO#: 27383

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
777 Bay Street, 19th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2C8
Phone: (416)212-8869 Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: 1235 Wilson Ave Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Date Received: 23 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMUEL RUEBEN DEVLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975