skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:13:48 PM

Fratesi, Sante Joseph

CPSO#: 27368

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 541-2315
Fax: (705) 759-5659 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sante Fratesi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 541-2315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANTE JOSEPH FRATESI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRATESI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975