skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:10:46 AM

Shelley, Eric Stevenson

CPSO#: 27308

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MOHLTC - Health Services Branch
49 D'Armes Pl
Kingston, Ontario
K7K6E1
Kingston ON  K7L 5V1
Phone: 613-536-3163 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shelley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shelley ( CPSO# 27308 )

Business Address:
MOHLTC
Health Services Branch
1055 Princess Street
Box 168
Kingston ON  K7L 5V1
Phone Number: (613) 536-3163

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC STEVENSON SHELLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHELLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975