skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 11:47:56 PM

Froats, Timothy Ralph

CPSO#: 27298

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Timothy Froats Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Froats ( CPSO# 27298 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY RALPH FROATS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROATS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1975